CA AB1244 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-26 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-26 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4677 and 4678 of, to add Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 4689.90) to Chapter 6 of Division 4.5 of, and to repeal Section 4685.7 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services.
Title
Developmental services: Self-Determination Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-05 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1244 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1244 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-26 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-05-24 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2011-07-05 | In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2011-06-29 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |
2011-06-16 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2011-06-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 1811.) | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-11 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-25 | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2011-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-04 | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4677 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4678 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4685.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4685.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4689.90 | New Code | See Bill Text |