CA AB1248 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 804, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 804, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 35183.1 to the Education Code, relating to pupils.
Title
Pupils: wearing of traditional tribal regalia or recognized objects of religious or cultural significance as an adornment at school graduation ceremonies.
Sponsors
Asm. Todd Gloria [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1248 GLORIA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1248 Gloria By Wilk (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Assembly - AB 1248 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-04 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Education] and [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1248 Gloria By Wilk (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Assembly - AB 1248 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-04 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Education] and [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 804, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 7024.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5983.). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2018-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 3815.) |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 17). |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on JUD.) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3715.) |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 4). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and P. & C.P. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 35183.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 53051 | Amended Code | Citation Text |