CA AB1250 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 19, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 19, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1041 of the Evidence Code, relating to privileged communications.
Title
Privileged communications: official information: identity of informer.
Sponsors
Asm. Henry Perea [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1250 Perea By Cannella (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1250 PEREA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1250 PEREA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 19, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-06-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 1273.). |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1115.) |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Evidence Code | 1041 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Evidence Code | 1064 | New Code | See Bill Text |