CA AB127 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19859 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 179.9, 3557, 7310, and 15820.948 of, and to add Section 31680.15 to, the Government Code, to add Section 13143.7 to the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 4032 of, and to add Section 29581 to, the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 714 and 715 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 127 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 127 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (September 13). |
2017-09-12 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2664.) |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2664.) |
2017-09-11 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2293.) |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 25. Page 1606.) |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 1511.) |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19859 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15820.948 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 179.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31680.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 3557 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 7310 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 13143.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 29581 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 4032 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 714 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 715 | Amended Code | Citation Text |