CA AB127 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 20, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 20, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 817 of the Penal Code, relating to arrest warrants.
Title
Arrest warrants: declaration of probable cause.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB127 Kamlager (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Assembly - AB 127 Kamlager Assembly Third Reading By STONE (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Assembly - AB 127 Kamlager Assembly Third Reading By STONE (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 20, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-06-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-06-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. | |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 1471.). |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 8. Page 1286.) |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 20). |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-12-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 18. |
2020-12-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 817 | Amended Code | Citation Text |