CA AB1296 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 9 (commencing with Section 1147) to Chapter 1 of Division 5 of the Harbors and Navigation Code, relating to bar pilots.
Title
Bar pilots: regulation of vessels.
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Grayson [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1296 Grayson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1296 Grayson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and E.Q. |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-06-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1596.) |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2023-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Harbors and Navigation Code | 1147 | New Code | See Bill Text |