CA AB1308 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 665, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 665, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2507, 2508, 2513, 2516, and 2519 of, and to add Section 2510 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 1204.3 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Midwifery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1308 BONILLA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1308 Bonilla By Corbett (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-10 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1308 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1308 Bonilla By Corbett (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-10 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1308 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 665, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3315.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (September 12). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3340.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3341.). |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2358.). |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 10). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (September 10). Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2013-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1467.) |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2507 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2508 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2510 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2513 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2516 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2519 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1204.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |