CA AB1308 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 126, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 126, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3075 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Apprenticeship programs: approval.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-02 - Assembly - AB 1308 PEREA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1308 Perea By Mendoza (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1308 PEREA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1308 Perea By Mendoza (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1308 PEREA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 126, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 2224.). |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 1617.). |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 1261.) |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 29). |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 3075 | Amended Code | Citation Text |