CA AB1310 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-29 - In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-29 - In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14122 and 14132.72 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: telehealth.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1310 Bonta By Hernandez (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1310 BROWN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1310 Bonta By Hernandez (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1310 BROWN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6667.) |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6550.) |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4860.). |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-06-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2013-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1825.) |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14122 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.72 | Amended Code | Citation Text |