CA AB1320 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-08-02 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-08-02 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 14550) to Division 7 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to workforce development.
Title
Workforce development: Lifelong Learning Accounts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1320 FONG Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1320 FONG Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-02 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. | |
2009-08-17 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-07-09 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 8). | |
2009-07-02 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2009-06-18 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2009-06-04 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-03 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 2045.) | |
2009-06-02 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-01 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). | |
2009-05-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-23 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 22). | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |