CA AB1371 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 12599.5 and 12635.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to fireworks, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Fireworks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-04 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-27 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2011-04-26 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-04 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 12599.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 12635.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127620 | Amended Code | Citation Text |