CA AB1371 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 36. Noes 28. Page 1908.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 36. Noes 28. Page 1908.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 2.5 (commencing with Section 42040) to Part 3 of Division 30 of, to add and repeal Chapter 5.1 (commencing with Section 42250) of Part 3 of Division 30 of, and to repeal Section 42042 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Recycling: plastic: packaging and carryout bags.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1371 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 28 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1371 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1371 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 36. Noes 28. Page 1908.). |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. (Page 1904.) |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Friedman. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 36. Noes 21. Page 1861.). |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 20). |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42040 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42250 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |