CA AB1373 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 192, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 192, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8617, 9000.5, and 9306 of the Family Code, relating to adoption.
Title
Adoption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-12 - Assembly - AB 1373 Patterson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1373 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1373 Patterson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1373 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1373 Patterson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 192, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-08-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2657.). |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1608.). |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2019-05-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1523.) |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 8617 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 9000.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 9306 | Amended Code | Citation Text |