CA AB138 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 668, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 668, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 9100 and 9400 of, and to add Section 9009 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to aging.
Title
Elder Economic Planning Act of 2011.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Loni Hancock [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Asm. Bonnie Lowenthal [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-06 - Assembly - AB 138 BEALL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB138 Beall By Liu (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 138 BEALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB138 Beall By Liu (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 138 BEALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 668, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2011-09-06 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 2898.). | |
2011-09-01 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-08-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2200.). | |
2011-08-30 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25). | |
2011-08-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-06-29 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2011-05-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 1639.) | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-13 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-03-30 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. | |
2011-01-14 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 13. | |
2011-01-13 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 9009 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 9100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 9400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |