CA AB138 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 78, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 78, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 19815.9, 20825.13, and 22944.6 to, and to repeal Section 22843.1 of, the Government Code, to add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 2693) to Part 11 of Division 2 of the Labor Code, and to amend Sections 316, 1095, 1339, 2655, 2701, 14005, 14013, and 14017 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 823 of, and to add Sections 340 and 14014 to, the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to employment, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Employment: health care benefits: unemployment insurance: policies and practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Assembly - AB 138 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 62 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB138 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 138 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB138 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 138 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 78, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 14. Page 2198.). |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 2192.) |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 2192.) |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 1756.). |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1750.) |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (June 30). |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1658.) |
2021-06-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1627.) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 480.) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19815.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20825.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 22843.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22944.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 1095 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1339 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 14005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 14013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 14017 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 2655 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 2701 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 316 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 823 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 2693 | New Code | See Bill Text |