CA AB1381 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17702.09 of the Corporations Code, relating to limited liability companies.
Title
Limited liability companies: statement of information: Secretary of State: notice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-27 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1381 Gallagher Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1381 Gallagher Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2022-05-31 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 3410.) |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 20). |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2022-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 17702.09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |