CA AB1387 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 524 to the Evidence Code, and to add Part 10.1 (commencing with Section 15706) to Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Taxation: State Board of Equalization: Franchise Tax
Sponsors
Asm. Van Tran [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-31 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |
2009-04-27 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2009-04-20 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1387&sess=0910&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1387_bill_20090227_introduced.html |