CA AB140 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 84, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 84, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 4659.5) to Chapter 5 of Division 4.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to services for persons with developmental disabilities.
Title
Developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-29 - Senate - Special Consent #11 AB140 Beall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-16 - Assembly - AB 140 BEALL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2009-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-16 - Assembly - AB 140 BEALL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2009-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 84, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-08-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-07-30 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2009-06-29 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-06-29 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1520.) | |
2009-06-25 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-06-24 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-23 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-06-10 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 9). | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2009-04-16 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-04-16 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 938.) | |
2009-04-02 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-04-01 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 1). | |
2009-03-25 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 24). | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2009-01-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 20. | |
2009-01-20 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4659.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |