CA AB140 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 111, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 111, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14671.2 of, and to add Section 12334 to, the Government Code, to amend Sections 37001, 50216, 50217, 50220.6, 50221, 50675.1, and 53559 of, to add Sections 50218.6, 50218.7, 50220.7, 50220.8, 50223, 50675.1.3, and 53559.3 to, to add Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 50250) and Chapter 8 (commencing with Section 50255) to Part 1 of, to add Chapter 3.15 (commencing with Section 50515.06), Chapter 5.5 (commencing with Section 50606), Chapter 6.6 (commencing with Section 50672), Chapter 8.2 (commencing with Section 50704.80), and Chapter 8.6 (commencing with Section 50720) to Part 2 of, Division 31 of, and to add and repeal Section 50675.1.4 of, the Health and Safety Code, to add Section 1785 to the Labor Code, and to add Sections 8257.1 and 8257.2 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to housing, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-15 - Assembly - AB 140 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 67 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB140 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 140 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB140 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 140 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 111, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 9. Page 2362.). |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2356.) |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2356.) |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1975.). |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 1962.) |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2021-07-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1658.) |
2021-06-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1627.) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 481.) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |