CA AB1407 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 415, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 415, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6347 to the Family Code, relating to family law.
Title
Family law: protective orders: wireless telephone numbers.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. Rocky Chavez [R] | Asm. Kansen Chu [D] | Asm. Jim Cooper [D] |
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] |
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-24 - Assembly - AB 1407 ATKINS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1407 Atkins (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1407 ATKINS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1407 Atkins (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1407 ATKINS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 415, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2563.). |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2119.). |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1817.) |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 2104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 296 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Family Code | 6347 | New Code | See Bill Text |