CA AB1407 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 4, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 4, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2262, 2263, 2265, 2266, 2267, 2268, 2269, and 2270 of the Elections Code, relating to voter registration.
Title
California New Motor Voter Program: voter registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Assembly - AB 1407 MCCARTY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 46 N: 22 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1407 McCarty et al. By Stern (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1407 MCCARTY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1407 McCarty et al. By Stern (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1407 MCCARTY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 4, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-02-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-02-22 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-02-20 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 22. Page 4063.). |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after February 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 3272.). |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Stern. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and T. & H. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 1646.) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 10). |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 2262 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2263 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2265 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2266 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2267 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2268 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2269 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2270 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |