CA AB1420 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 245, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 245, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 26720, 26725, 26800, and 28160 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Assembly - AB 1420 Berman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1420 Berman By Blakespear (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1420 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1420 Berman By Blakespear (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1420 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 245, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3591.). |
2023-09-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 2778.). |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2023-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1778.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.) |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 26720 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26725 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 28160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |