CA AB1431 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 753, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 753, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 20919.15 of, and to add and repeal Article 60.4 (commencing with Section 20919.20) of Chapter 1 of Part 3 of Division 2 of, the Public Contract Code, relating to local public contracting.
Title
Local Agency Public Construction Act: job order contracting.
Sponsors
Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D] | Asm. Jim Cooper [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Asm. Roger Hernandez [D] |
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-04 - Assembly - AB 1431 GOMEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1431 Gomez By Lara (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1431 Gomez By Lara Reconsider (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1431 Gomez By Lara (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1431 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1431 Gomez By Lara (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1431 Gomez By Lara Reconsider (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1431 Gomez By Lara (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1431 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 753, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 27. Page 2905.). |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2392.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Lara. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2415.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 2431.). |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 13). |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 17). |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 1559.) |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65583 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20919.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20919.20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |