CA AB1441 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19596.2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to horse racing.
Title
Horse racing: out-of-state thoroughbred races: Whitney
Sponsors
Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-01-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19596.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19720 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25664 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 336.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 337 | Amended Code | Citation Text |