CA AB1441 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-11 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-11 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 977 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment insurance, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Unemployment compensation: employers: contribution rates.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1441 Levine Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 18. Page 3912.) |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (January 23). |
2020-01-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (January 13). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Unemployment Insurance Code | 977 | Amended Code | Citation Text |