CA AB153 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 17205 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Personal income taxes: deduction: students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. |
2019-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB153 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB153 |