CA AB1536 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 92, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 92, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23123.5 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: electronic wireless communications:
Sponsors
Asm. Jeff Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1536 Miller By DeSaulnier (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Assembly - AB 1536 MILLER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Assembly - AB 1536 MILLER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 92, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-07-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-07-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2012-06-28 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2012-06-28 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4180.). | |
2012-06-14 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-13 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). | |
2012-05-17 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-05-07 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-07 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 3. Page 4704.) | |
2012-05-03 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4662.) | |
2012-04-25 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-24 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23). | |
2012-04-16 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-19 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-02-02 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-01-25 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 24. | |
2012-01-24 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 23123.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |