CA AB1536 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 11.5 (commencing with Section 44390) to Chapter 2 of Part 25 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Education Code, and to amend Section 17072 of, and to add Sections 17208 and 24343.9 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to teacher credentialing, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Teacher credentialing: Technology Education Credential “TEC” Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and REV. & TAX. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44390 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 47601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17072 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17208 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 24343.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1536 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1536 |