CA AB1542 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 71004 and 88931 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges: student members: Student Success Completion Grant program awards.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Fong [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1542 Mike Fong Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 1524.) |
2023-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 71004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 88931 | Amended Code | Citation Text |