CA AB156 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 629.52 of the Penal Code, relating to human trafficking.
Title
Human trafficking: interception of electronic communications.
Sponsors
Asm. Chris Holden [D] | Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] | Asm. Manuel Perez [D] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Asm. Mariko Yamada [D] | Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] | Sen. Ted Gaines [R] | Sen. Ted Lieu [D] |
Sen. Carol Liu [D] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, final hearing. Held under submission. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-03-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-03-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2013-01-31 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-01-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 22. |
2013-01-22 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 629.52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |