CA AB156 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 569, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 569, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6013.5.5, 8017, 8018, 8020, and 8024 of, to add Sections 8017.5 and 8024.8 to, and to repeal Section 8016.5 of, the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 100000.5, 100002, and 100013 of the Financial Code, to add and repeal Section 1357 of the Fish and Game Code, to amend Sections 7903, 11852, 11854, 11860, 11862, 11880, 11890, 11892, 11894, 12803.2, 12815, 15849.1, 16344, 65057, and 65059 of, to amend the heading of Article 2 (commencing with Section 11860) of Chapter 10 of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, to add Sections 11856, 11865, and 11868 to, to add and repeal Section 11019.1 of, to repeal Section 13300.5 of, and to repeal, add, and repeal Section 11864 of, the Government Code, to add and repeal Sections 50834.5 and 50899.8 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 2673.1, 2675.5, 2695.1, 2695.2, 3111, 3111.1, 3112, and 3122.3 of, and to add and repeal Sections 2695.3 and 2695.4 to, the Labor Code, to amend Sections 4124.5, 4208.1, and 4799.05 of, and to add and repeal Section 75245 of, the Public Resources Code, to amend Section 95.60 of, and to add Section 17141.5 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Sections 1095 and 14531 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, to add Chapter 16.1 (commencing with Section 18997.5) to Part 6 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, and to amend Section 106 of Chapter 73 of the Statutes of 2021, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 156 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB156 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 156 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB156 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 156 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 569, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 8.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 3.). |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Senate rules suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9.). |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (August 29). |
2022-08-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 1962.) |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2021-07-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1658.) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1627.) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 489.) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |