CA AB1563 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 69432, 69432.7, and 69439 of, and to add Section 69439.5 to, the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.
Title
Student financial aid: Cal Grant C awards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69432 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69432.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69439 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69439.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 69511 | Amended Code | Citation Text |