CA AB1565 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 808, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 808, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 20111.6 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: school districts: bidding requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1565 FUENTES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1565 Fuentes By Padilla (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1565 FUENTES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1565 Fuentes By Padilla (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1565 FUENTES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 808, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-29 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 26. Page 6535.). | |
2012-08-28 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-28 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 4887.). | |
2012-08-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-22 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-16 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2012-08-06 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-07-06 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-07-05 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 27). | |
2012-06-21 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-06-18 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-06-14 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-05-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-30 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 5105.) | |
2012-05-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-05-02 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-30 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-26 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 18). | |
2012-03-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and ED. | |
2012-01-31 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. | |
2012-01-30 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 20111.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 20111.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |