CA AB1565 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 528, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 528, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 218.7 of the Labor Code, relating to employment, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Labor-related liabilities: direct contractor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1565 THURMOND Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-22 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1565 Thurmond Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1565 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 27 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-22 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1565 Thurmond Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1565 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 27 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 528, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6652.). |
2018-08-22 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 22). |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6330.) |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5277.). |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2017-09-16 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 27. Page 1846.) |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1652.) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 10). |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 218.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 514.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |