CA AB1565 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 8, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 8, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 31752 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to cats.
Title
Stray cats: adoption: kittens.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1565 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Assembly - AB 1565 Quirk Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Assembly - AB 1565 Quirk Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 8, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-06-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1450.). |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1402.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 31752 | Amended Code | Citation Text |