CA AB1572 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 299, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 299, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2555.1 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to vehicles, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Service authorities for freeway emergencies: San Diego
Sponsors
Sen. Joel Anderson [R] | Sen. Marty Block [D] | Asm. Nathan Fletcher [R] | Sen. Christine Kehoe [D] |
Sen. Mark Wyland [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1572 FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent #16 AB1572 Fletcher (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1572 FLETCHER Third Reading Urgency (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent #16 AB1572 Fletcher (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1572 FLETCHER Third Reading Urgency (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 299, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. | |
2012-08-27 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6364.). | |
2012-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-23 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4785.). | |
2012-08-15 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2012-08-14 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-13 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 6). | |
2012-08-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-28 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). | |
2012-06-14 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-06-04 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-31 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5169.). | |
2012-05-29 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5029.) | |
2012-05-07 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-03 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-05-02 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2). | |
2012-04-24 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-23 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-19 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 16). | |
2012-04-11 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-04-10 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-09 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-02-17 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-02-02 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. | |
2012-02-01 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 2555.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |