CA AB1572 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 18410.3 to, and to add and repeal Sections 17053.9 and 23622.9 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Personal income taxes: corporation taxes: credits: California New Markets Tax Credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on J.,E.D., & E. and REV. & TAX. |
2021-03-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 4. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18410.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23622.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |