CA AB1577 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Failed on August 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-31 - Filed with the Chief Clerk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Failed on August 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-31 - Filed with the Chief Clerk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 12.5 (commencing with Section 3599.50) to Division 4 of Title 1 of the Government Code, relating to the Legislature.
Title
Collective bargaining: Legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1577 Stone et al. By Wiener (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - AB 1577 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1577 Stone et al. By Wiener (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - AB 1577 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Filed with the Chief Clerk. |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Reconsideration refused. (Ayes 2. Noes 5.) |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | In committee: Motion "to be concurred in" failed passage. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 2.). |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1718.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1253.). |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21). |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 8. |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3599.50 | New Code | See Bill Text |