CA AB1608 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 39617.8 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to air quality.
Title
Clean Vehicle Rebate Project and Hybrid Truck and Bus
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2012-05-09 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-24 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-16 | In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2012-04-11 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-04-10 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-09 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-19 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-03-12 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-03-08 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-17 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-02-08 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. | |
2012-02-07 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39617.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44274.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |