CA AB1608 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 669, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 669, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 7512.3, 7525.1, 7529, 7530,7538, 7538.5, 7539, and 7570 of, and to add and repeal Section 7520.3 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to private investigators.
Title
Private investigators: limited liability companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1608 OLSEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1608 Olsen By Vidak (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1608 OLSEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1608 Olsen By Vidak (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1608 OLSEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 669, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6514.). |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 4823.). |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4971.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and JUD. |
2014-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2014-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7512.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7525.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7529 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7530 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7538 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7538.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7539 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7570 | New Code | See Bill Text |