CA AB1608 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1522, 1568.082, 1568.09, 1568.092, 1569.17, 1569.50, 1569.58, 1596.871, 1596.885, 1596.8897, and 1796.23 of, and to add Section 1522.6 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to community care facilities.
Title
Community care facilities: criminal background checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - Assembly - AB 1608 Holden Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 18 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 18. Page 3939.) |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 3893.) |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (January 23). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 23). |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1522 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1522.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1568.082 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1568.09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1568.092 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1569.17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1569.50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1569.58 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1596.871 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1596.885 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1596.8897 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1796.23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |