CA AB1609 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-31 - Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 6912.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-31 - Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 6912.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act making appropriations for the support of the government of the State of California and for several public purposes in accordance with the provisions of Section 12 of Article IV of the Constitution of the State of California, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
2010-11 Budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1609 BLUMENFIELD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-31 | Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 6912.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |
2010-08-30 | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 6820.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-08-11 | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2010-08-10 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-06-10 | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2010-06-07 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2010-01-12 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. (Corrected February 1.) | |
2010-01-11 | Read first time. | |
2010-01-08 | Introduced. To print. |