CA AB1609 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-26 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-26 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2717 of the Public Resources Code, relating to surface mining.
Title
Surface mining: determinations: appeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1609 LARA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-26 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-06-21 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-06-14 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2012-05-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-30 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5109.) | |
2012-05-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-05-09 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-26 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-25 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-24 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 16). | |
2012-02-17 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2012-02-08 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. | |
2012-02-07 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 2717 | Amended Code | Citation Text |