CA AB161 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 261, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 261, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6325.5 to the Family Code, relating to restraining orders.
Title
Restraining orders.
Sponsors
Asm. Nora Campos [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-08-19 - Assembly - AB 161 CAMPOS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB161 Campos By Jackson (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Assembly - AB 161 CAMPOS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB161 Campos By Jackson (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Assembly - AB 161 CAMPOS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 261, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2577.). |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1687.). |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 885.) |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 2). |
2013-01-31 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-01-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 22. |
2013-01-22 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 6325.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |