CA AB161 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-07 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-07 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7514.2 of the Government Code, relating to public employees’ retirement.
Title
Public employees’ retirement: pension fund management.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 161 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 161 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 14. Page 1903.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 26). |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 16. |
2017-01-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13314 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 7514.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |