CA AB1611 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-08 - Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 5255.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-08 - Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 5255.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to education finance, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Education finance: Proposition 98: suspension.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-10-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1611 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) Urgency Clause (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1611 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 27 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1611 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 27 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-08 | Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 5255.) | |
2010-10-07 | Read third time and amended. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Page 5227.) | |
2010-08-09 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-05 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. | |
2010-04-27 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-04-22 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-04-22 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 7. Page 4799.) | |
2010-04-20 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-04-19 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-04-15 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 15). | |
2010-04-12 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4592.) | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2010-01-12 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. | |
2010-01-11 | Read first time. To print. |