CA AB1611 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1602, 1609, 1610, 1613, 1615, 2942, 12157, and 12159.5 of, and to add Sections 2081.2 and 12008.1 to, the Fish and Game Code, to repeal and add Section 52334 of the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Sections 8670.48.3 and 12812.2 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 25150.7, 25150.84, 25189.3, 25205.7, 25205.18, 25205.19, 25247, 100829, 100860.1, 100862, 105206, 116590, and 116681 of, and to add Section 25253.5 to, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 10187.5 and 10190 of the Public Contract Code, to amend Sections 4629.6 and 4629.8 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 21191 of, to add Chapter 6.5 (commencing with Section 25550) to Division 15 of, and to repeal the heading of Chapter 6.5 (commencing with Section 25550) of Division 15 of, the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 43053 and 43152.10 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 5106 and 5108 of the Vehicle Code, to amend Sections 1430, 1440, and 13205 of, and to add and repeal Section 79717 of, the Water Code, to amend Section 258 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, and to amend Section 11 of Chapter 2 of the Statutes of 2009 of the Seventh Extraordinary Session, relating to public resources, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ( Supplemental File 1)AB 1611 Co mmittee on Budget By (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1611 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1611 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | Died on inactive file. |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Ting. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (June 27). Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 4539.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 4546.). |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4410.) |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 4575.) |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 4488.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |