CA AB1613 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-08 - Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 26. Noes 7. Page 5256.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-08 - Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 26. Noes 7. Page 5256.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 56.30 of the Civil Code, to amend Section 854.1 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 1324.20, 1324.21, 1324.22, 1324.23, 1324.27, 1324.28, 1324.30, 1567.50, 120917, 130251, 130500, 130507, 130509, and 130543 of, to amend and repeal Section 1324.29 of, and to add Sections 1356.2, 1417.5, 120971, 130250.1, 130251.15, 130252, 130253, and 130254 to, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 12693.21 and 12693.26 of, and to add Section 12693.23 to, the Insurance Code, to amend Sections 12009, 12204, 12207, 12242, 12251, 12253, 12254, 12257, 12258, 12260, 12301, 12302, 12303, 12304, 12305, 12307, 12412, 12413, 12421, 12422, 12423, 12427, 12428, 12429, 12431, 12433, 12434, 12491, 12493, 12494, 12601, 12602, 12631, 12632, 12636, 12636.5, 12679, 12681, 12801, 12951, 12977, 12983, 12984, and 13108 of, and to amend, add, and repeal Section 12201 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Sections 4474.2, 4474.3, 4474.4, 4474.5, 4474.8, 4684.50, 4684.53, 4684.55, 4684.58, 4684.60, 4684.63, 4684.65, 4684.70, 4684.75, 5370.2, 10022, 14005.11, 14089, 14089.05, 14089.4, 14091.3, 14126.023, 14126.027, 14126.033, 14132, 14154, 14165.4, 14301.1, and 14301.11 of, to amend the heading of Article 3.5 (commencing with Section 4684.50) of Chapter 6 of Division 4.5 of, to add Sections 4101.5, 4646.55, 4701.1, 4791, 5813.6, 14105.08, 14105.28, 14105.281, 14105.456, 14126.022, 14132.925, 14167.351, and 14183.6 to, to repeal Article 3.8 (commencing with Section 14126) of Chapter 7 of Part 3 of Division 9 of, to repeal and amend Section 14005.25 of, and to repeal and add Section 4684.74 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, and to amend Section 10 of Chapter 13 of the Third Extraordinary Session of the Statutes of 2009, relating to health, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-10-08 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB1613 Committee on BUDGET (Evans) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-10-07 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB1613 Committee on BUDGET (Evans) Lay on Table (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-10-07 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB1613 Committee on BUDGET (Evans) Lay on Table (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1613 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 27 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-07 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB1613 Committee on BUDGET (Evans) Lay on Table (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-10-07 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB1613 Committee on BUDGET (Evans) Lay on Table (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1613 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 27 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-08 | Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 26. Noes 7. Page 5256.) | |
2010-10-07 | Read second time. To third reading. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Page 5222.) | |
2010-10-06 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-09 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-05 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. | |
2010-04-27 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-04-22 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-04-22 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 7. Page 4800.) | |
2010-04-20 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-04-19 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-04-15 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 15). | |
2010-04-12 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4592.) | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2010-01-12 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. | |
2010-01-11 | Read first time. To print. |