CA AB1613 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 370, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 370, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2016 (Chapter 23 of the Statutes of 2016) by amending Item 3340-001-0318 of, and adding Items 0521-101-3228, 0540-101-3228, 0650-002-3228, 0650-101-3228, 0650-490, 2240-491, 2660-108-3228, 3540-001-3228, 3900-101-3228, 3970-101-3228, 4700-101-3228, 8570-101-3228 to, Section 2.00 of, and amending Section 39.00 of, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2016.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1613 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 51 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ( Supplemental File 1)AB 1613 Co mmittee on Budget By (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1613 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ( Supplemental File 1)AB 1613 Co mmittee on Budget By (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1613 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 370, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 6558.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 6560.). |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5546.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 5574.). |
2016-08-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Measure version as amended on August 22 corrected. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 5277.) |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 5239.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-08-09 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 4576.) |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 4488.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |