CA AB1628 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 360, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 360, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 56668 and 65040.12 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 30107.3 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental justice.
Title
Environmental justice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1628 Robert Rivas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1628 Robert Rivas et al. By Gonzalez (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1628 Robert Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1628 Robert Rivas et al. By Gonzalez (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1628 Robert Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 360, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 15. Page 3115.). |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 2504.). |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and JUD. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 1632.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 8). |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 56668 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65040.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 30107.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |